+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (60)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0789
- Effective Date July 22, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Arthur L. Turner
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 6, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Clayborne
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2004
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2004
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 011-000-000
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
- Fiscal Note Filed
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 2,3
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur L. Turner
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur L. Turner
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur L. Turner
- Judicial Note Filed
- Home Rule Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Lovana Jones
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Lovana Jones
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Lovana Jones
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Lovana Jones
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 012-002-005
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur L. Turner
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Inserts provisions substantially similar to those of HB 4481, except: (1) provides that the Commission shall consist of two members (rather than one member) of the State Senate, one appointed by the House Minority Leader and the other appointed by the Senate Minority Leader; (2) provides that the Commission shall consist of two members (rather than one member) of the State House of Representatives, one appointed by the House Minority Leader and the other appointed by the Senate Minority Leader; (3) provides that an affected property is lead-free if it was constructed after 1960 (rather than 1978); (4) provides that subsequent inspections of affected properties shall occur at intervals of not greater than 3 years; and (4) deletes a Section concerning the bases of civil liability for alleged injury or loss to a person caused by the ingestion of lead by a person at risk in an affected property.
House Floor Amendment No. 3
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Lead Poisoning Prevention Act. Provides that the Lead-Safe Housing Advisory Council shall include one representative from the Illinois Paint and Coatings Industry.
House Floor Amendment No. 3
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Lead Poisoning Prevention Act. Provides that the Lead-Safe Housing Advisory Council shall include one representative from the Illinois Paint and Coatings Industry.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -