+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- To Law Enforcement Subcommittee
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 50 ILCS 705/6 - from Ch. 85, par. 506
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1069.3
- 65 ILCS 5/10-4-2.3
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.53 new
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor