+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 011-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Jim Durkin
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-001-000
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/5-4-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-4-3