+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- To Facilities Subcommittee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor