+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 5 ILCS 120/2 - from Ch. 102, par. 42
- 5 ILCS 140/7 - from Ch. 116, par. 207
- 5 ILCS 315/7 - from Ch. 48, par. 1607
- 5 ILCS 315/24 - from Ch. 48, par. 1624
- 115 ILCS 5/10 - from Ch. 48, par. 1710
- 115 ILCS 5/18 - from Ch. 48, par. 1718
+ − Vote
February 8, 2017: HB0447 - Labor & Commerce Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor