+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On August 1, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mike Fortner
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor