+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed As Amended by HA 2
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed As Amended by HA 2
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 2
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Labor Committee; 007-005-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor Committee; 008-004-000
- Balanced Budget Note Filed As Amended by HA 2
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Sponsor Removed Rep. William Davis
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 2
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 2
- Home Rule Note Filed As Amended by HA 2
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor Committee
- Pension Note Filed As Amended by HA 2
- Judicial Note Filed As Amended by HA 2
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 2
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor Committee; 010-000-002
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Labor Committee
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor Committee
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of House Bill 4462, changing the place at which the amendatory text concerning the Department of Labor's rules is inserted in the existing law. Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of House Bill 4462, changing the place at which the amendatory text concerning the Department of Labor's rules is inserted in the existing law. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 105/4a - from Ch. 48, par. 1004a
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor