+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 6, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-008-000
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia Reid Lindner
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the purpose of the grant is for support services for children (instead of for child support services).