+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ronald A. Wait
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/5-5-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-5-3
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor