+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- To Finance Subcommittee
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz