+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- To Income Tax Subcommittee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski