+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 10 ILCS 5/1-6 -
- 30 ILCS 500/15-45 -
- 105 ILCS 5/24-2 - from Ch. 122, par. 24-2
- 205 ILCS 630/17 - from Ch. 17, par. 2201