+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0725
- Effective Date January 1, 2015
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 112-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 015-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2014
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mulroe
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2014
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2014
- Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 6, 2014
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 014-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Peace Officer Firearm Training Act. Changes the name of the Act to the Peace Officer and Probation Officer Firearm Training Act. Defines "probation officer". Provides that the training requirements of the Act also apply to probation officers. Amends the Probation and Probation Officers Act. Provides that probation officers may only carry weapons while in the performance of their official duties, or while commuting between their homes, places of employment, or specific locations that are part of their assigned duties, provided they have received the prior consent of the Chief Judge of the Circuit Court for which they are employed, and they have received weapons training according to requirements of the Peace Officer and Probation Officer Firearm Training Act. Amends various other Acts to make conforming changes.
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
- 730 ILCS 110/9b - from Ch. 38, par. 204-1b
- 730 ILCS 110/9b -
- 20 ILCS 2910/1 - from Ch. 127 1/2, par. 501
- 50 ILCS 705/10.4 -
- 50 ILCS 710/Act title -
- 50 ILCS 710/0.01 - from Ch. 85, par. 514
- 50 ILCS 710/1 - from Ch. 85, par. 515
- 50 ILCS 710/2 - from Ch. 85, par. 516
- 50 ILCS 710/2.5 -
- 50 ILCS 710/3 - from Ch. 85, par. 517
- 55 ILCS 5/3-6013 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-6013
- 55 ILCS 5/5-37011 - from Ch. 34, par. 5-37011
- 60 ILCS 1/100-10 -
- 65 ILCS 5/3.1-30-20 - from Ch. 24, par. 3.1-30-20
- 70 ILCS 200/240-40 -
- 70 ILCS 1325/1 - from Ch. 105, par. 330a
- 110 ILCS 1020/1 - from Ch. 144, par. 1951
- 510 ILCS 5/5 - from Ch. 8, par. 355
- 720 ILCS 5/24-2 -
- 730 ILCS 110/17 new -