+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On May 15, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-001-000
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 11, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
May 15, 2008: HB4416 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 15, 2008
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor