+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 7, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
+ − Statute Amended
- 775 ILCS 5/1-103 - from Ch. 68, par. 1-103
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor