+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor