+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Correctional Note Filed
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 003-000-002
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 008-002-003
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson