+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brent Hassert
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 720 ILCS 5/2-8.5 new -
- 720 ILCS 5/10-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 10-2
- 720 ILCS 5/12-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-2
- 720 ILCS 5/12-4 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-4
- 720 ILCS 5/18-5 -
- 720 ILCS 5/20-1.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 20-1.1
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor