+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Higher Education Committee; 009-007-000
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
March 2, 2016: HB4393 - Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor