+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 26, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto August 11, 2015
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Amendatory Veto
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2015
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2015
- Do Pass Insurance; 013-001-001
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-004-000
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2015
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Amends bill by requiring a contract carrier transporting employees, including but not limited to railroad employees, to verify hit and run and uninsured motor vehicle coverage, as well as underinsured motor vehicle coverage, in an amount not less than $500,000 (rather than $1,000,000) per passenger beginning on January 1, 2016, and not less than $750,000 per passenger on and after January 1, 2020.
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/8-101 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 8-101
+ − Votes (5)
May 14, 2015: HB0439 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 14, 2015
April 29, 2015: HB0439 - Insurance - Apr 29, 2015
April 14, 2015: HB0439 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 14, 2015
March 18, 2015: HFA0001 - Transportation: Vehicles & Safety - Mar 18, 2015
February 19, 2015: HB0439 - Transportation: Vehicles & Safety - Feb 19, 2015
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor