+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 20, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0292
- Effective Date August 20, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 21, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2007
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 29, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-001
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 011-001-000
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/12-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-2
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2007: HB0439 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 23, 2007
March 27, 2007: HB0439 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 27, 2007
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor