+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-002-001
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Drivers Education & Safety Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Drivers Education & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Drivers Education & Safety Committee; 011-000-000
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Drivers Education & Safety Committee
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John D'Amico
On January 11, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael K. Smith
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. Provides that a school board shall require that all vehicles purchased or leased on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act that are used for the practice driving part of a driver education course offered by the school district have a Vehicle Identification Number that begins with the number one, the number 4, or the number 5. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/1-2 - from Ch. 122, par. 1-2