+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 4, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor