+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Juvenile Justice Reform Committee
On January 11, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 730 ILCS 5/3-3-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-3-3
- 730 ILCS 5/3-6-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-6-3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor