+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2014
- Arrive in Senate
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 016-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Environment
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Adds additional legislative findings. Changes the definitions of "treatment works" and "local government unit". Provides new purposes for the Water Pollution Control Loan Program. Makes a change to a provision concerning rules for prioritizing loans under the Act.
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 415 ILCS 5/4 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1004
- 415 ILCS 5/19.2 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1019.2
- 415 ILCS 5/19.3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1019.3
- 415 ILCS 5/4 -
- 415 ILCS 5/19.1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1019.1
- 415 ILCS 5/19.4 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1019.4
+ − Vote
April 3, 2014: HB4382 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 03, 2014
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor