+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 006-000-000
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 4, 2020: HB4382 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor