+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1040
- Effective Date August 25, 2014
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 083-030-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-004-000
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2014
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2014
- Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2014
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-042-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the engrossed bill with the following changes: provides that the task force shall consist of 8 (rather than 7) members, one of whom shall be appointed by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation (rather than the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation) and be a representative of the Department; one of whom shall be appointed by the Department (rather than the Secretary) and be a representative of a statewide association representing CPAs; one of whom shall be appointed by the Department (rather than the Secretary) and be an enrolled agent or representative of the tax return preparation industry; one of whom shall be the Director of Revenue or his or her designee; one of whom shall be appointed by the Speaker of the House of Representatives; one of whom shall be appointed by the President of the Senate; one of whom shall be appointed by the Minority Leader of the House of Representatives; and one of whom shall be appointed by the Minority Leader of the Senate. Further provides that the task force shall meet no less than 3 times before the end of the year in which the amendatory Act becomes effective and requires the task force to submit its report by no later than December 1, 2015 (rather than December 1, 2014). Provides a repeal date of July 1, 2016 (rather than December 1, 2015). Effective immediately.
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Public Accounting Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall convene a task force in order to prepare a report that determines the appropriate scope of a program for regulating commercial tax return preparers, addresses the appropriate qualifications for commercial tax return preparers, and considers any other matters the task force determines to be necessary or appropriate. Further provides that the task force shall consist of 7 members, one of whom shall be appointed by the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation and be a representative of the Department; one of whom shall be appointed by the Secretary and be a representative of a statewide association representing CPAs; one of whom shall be appointed by the Secretary and be an enrolled agent or representative of the tax return preparation industry; one of whom shall be appointed by the Speaker of the House of Representatives; one of whom shall be appointed by the President of the Senate; one of whom shall be appointed by the Minority Leader of the House of Representatives; and one of whom shall be appointed by the Minority Leader of the Senate. Requires that the report be submitted by no later than December 1, 2014 to the Secretary, the Governor, and the General Assembly. Further provides that members of the task force shall receive no compensation, but shall be reimbursed for expenses necessarily incurred in the performance of their duties. Provides that these provisions shall be repealed on December 1, 2015. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Public Accounting Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall convene a task force in order to prepare a report that determines the appropriate scope of a program for regulating commercial tax return preparers, addresses the appropriate qualifications for commercial tax return preparers, and considers any other matters the task force determines to be necessary or appropriate. Further provides that the task force shall consist of 7 members, one of whom shall be appointed by the Department and be a representative of the Department; one of whom shall be appointed by the Department and be a representative of a statewide association representing CPAs; one of whom shall be appointed by the Department and be an enrolled agent or representative of the tax return preparation industry; one of whom shall be appointed by the majority caucus leader of the House of Representatives; one of whom shall be appointed by the majority caucus leader of the Senate; one of whom shall be appointed by the minority caucus leader of the House of Representatives; and one of whom shall be appointed by the minority caucus leader of the Senate. Requires that the report be submitted by no later than December 1, 2014 to the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation, the Governor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, and the President of the Senate. Further provides that members of the task force shall receive no compensation, but shall be reimbursed for expenses necessarily incurred in the performance of their duties. Effective immediately.