+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Substance Abuse Special; 008-000-000
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Substance Abuse Special
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 10, 2015: HB0438 - Substance Abuse Special Committee - Mar 10, 2015
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor