+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-001-001
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Executive Committee
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On January 11, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marlow H. Colvin
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/34-83.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-83.1
- 30 ILCS 805/8.32 new -