+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Remains in Juvenile Justice Reform Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Juvenile Justice Reform Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Juvenile Justice Reform Committee
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Juvenile Justice Reform Committee
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the court may (rather than shall) order any minor found to be delinquent to be enrolled in a streetgang workshop detention program.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor