+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 20, 2018 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0617
- Effective Date July 20, 2018
- Governor Approved
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
- Second Reading
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
- Do Pass Education; 010-000-000
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
- Arrive in Senate
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-000-000
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer