+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Statute Amended
- 525 ILCS 15/1 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 9101
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor