+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Remains in Higher Education Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Higher Education Committee; 004-004-001
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson