+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 29, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0667
- Effective Date July 29, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 031-017-003
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016
- Second Reading
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2016
- Do Pass Executive; 010-003-000
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2016
- Arrive in Senate
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-047-001
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 007-002-000
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 105 ILCS 5/10-21.9 - from Ch. 122, par. 10-21.9
- 105 ILCS 5/21B-15 -
- 105 ILCS 5/21B-80 -
- 105 ILCS 5/34-18.5 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-18.5
+ − Votes (4)
May 25, 2016: HB4360 - Third Reading
May 11, 2016: HB4360 - Executive
April 12, 2016: HB4360 - Third Reading
February 10, 2016: HB4360 - Restorative Justice - Feb 10, 2016
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor