+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor