+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brent Hassert
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor