+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tim Butler
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tim Butler
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tim Butler
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tim Butler
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tim Butler
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tim Butler
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tim Butler
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tim Butler
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Racial Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tim Butler
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tim Butler
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tim Butler
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 018-008-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 018-008-000
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Remains in Energy & Environment Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Energy & Environment Committee; 014-009-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 018-010-000
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2022: HFA0003 - Energy & Environment
March 2, 2022: HFA0002 - Energy & Environment
February 23, 2022: HFA0002 - Energy & Environment
February 1, 2022: HB4358 - Energy & Environment
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor