+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On August 17, 2018 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0901
- Effective Date January 1, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 29, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
On May 28, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John Connor
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2018
- Second Reading
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
- Do Pass as Amended State Government; 006-000-000
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-000-001
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (8)
May 31, 2018: SCA0001 - Concurrence
May 29, 2018: SCA0001 - Judiciary - Criminal
May 23, 2018: HB4348 - Third Reading
May 9, 2018: HB4348 - State Government
May 9, 2018: SCA0001 - State Government
April 19, 2018: HB4348 - Third Reading
April 17, 2018: HFA0001 - Judiciary - Criminal
March 6, 2018: HB4348 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor