+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (53)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0887
- Effective Date August 25, 2016
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 (M2) Motion to Suspend Rule 15(d) - Prevailed
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 (M2) Moved to Suspend Rule 15(d)
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2016
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016
- Do Pass Executive; 017-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment 001
Makes the added provision inoperative on and after June 30, 2017.
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as amended by House Amendment No. 2 with the following changes. Provides that a computer print-out from the Secretary of State's website setting forth the calendar months in which registration renewal notices were not sent to all owners of passenger vehicles of the first division and motor vehicles of the second division weighing not more than 8,000 pounds shall be admissible as evidence to establish an affirmative defense to a citation issued by any local, county, municipal, or State law enforcement agency within one month after the expiration of the vehicle expiration. Provides the computer print-out shall be prima facie evidence of the correctness of the information contained in it.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall not impose a delinquent registration renewal fee if a vehicle's registration expires during a period of time in which no notice, by U.S. mail, was sent to the vehicle owner by the Secretary. Provides that any local, county, municipal, or State law enforcement agency may not issue a citation for an expired registration until one month after the expiration of the registration. Provides that the Secretary may resume collection of the delinquent registration renewal fee when the Secretary resumes mailing the registration renewal notices to vehicle owners, and that any local, county, municipal, or State law enforcement agency may resume citing a vehicle with an expired registration without waiting the one-month period. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act apply only to vehicle registrations that expire on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 625 ILCS 5/3-415 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-415
- 625 ILCS 5/3-821.2 -