+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 6, 2014
- Arrive in Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-002
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee; 017-000-000
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 5, 2014: HB4334 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 05, 2014
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor