+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 13, 2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/11-907 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-907