+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Statute Amended
- 25 ILCS 170/1 - from Ch. 63, par. 171
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor