+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading July 10, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 22, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On April 16, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 18, 2008
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 9, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry R. Ramey, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 150/6 - from Ch. 38, par. 226
+ − Vote
May 31, 2008: HB4305 - Third Reading - Saturday, May 31, 2008
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor