+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor