+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 17, 2005 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0042
- Effective Date June 17, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 9, 2005 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2005 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2005
- Second Reading
On April 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2005
- Do Pass Labor; 008-000-000
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 24, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-010-000
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Local Government Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Local Government Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Local Government Committee
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 16, 2004 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Inserts provisions substantially similar to those of HB 43 except: (1) provides that if individual portable units are used, separate toileting facilities are not required for males and females and toileting facilities provided shall comply with the Occupational Safety and Health Administration construction sanitation standards; (2) provides that for non-residential temporary buildings or non-residential buildings, the restroom facilities shall be located within 300 feet of the entrance of the building under construction; and (3) for residential temporary buildings or residential buildings, the restroom facilities shall be made readily available in nearby areas. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -