+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 320 ILCS 20/4 - from Ch. 23, par. 6604
- 320 ILCS 20/4.1 -
- 320 ILCS 20/4.2 -
- 320 ILCS 20/5 - from Ch. 23, par. 6605
- 320 ILCS 20/8 - from Ch. 23, par. 6608