+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On December 20, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces language concerning the property of the Cook County Forest Preserve District with language providing that a concealed carry licensee shall not knowingly carry a firearm on any adventure course or zipline, aquatic center, campground, equestrian center, nature center grounds, picnic grove, playground, sledding hill, sledding hill grounds, and any parking area of any of the aforementioned under the control of the Cook County Forest Preserve District, and any public or private gathering or special event conducted on property that requires the issuance of a permit by the Cook County Forest Preserve District.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 17, 2022: HB4296 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor