+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date May 5, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0718
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-000
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Pensions; 008-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2022
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-002-000
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Bob Morgan
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On December 20, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2022: HB4292 - Third Reading
March 9, 2022: HB4292 - Pensions
February 24, 2022: HB4292 - Third Reading
January 20, 2022: HB4292 - Personnel & Pensions
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor