+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
On October 30, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
On September 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On September 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On August 31, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sheri Jesiel
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 5 ILCS 100/5-45 - from Ch. 127, par. 1005-45
- 30 ILCS 500/45-46 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor