+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 28, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-001-004
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-002-000
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 9, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia Reid Lindner
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 22, 2008: HB4288 - Third Reading - Friday, February 22, 2008
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor